Lauro v. State of Hawaii et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Lauro
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Public Safety, Halawa Correctional Facility, Waiawa Correctional Facility, Sisar Paderes, Gary Saldana, Steven Dewitt and Doe Defendants 1-100
Case Number: 1:2012cv00637
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/3/2015. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 24, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF THOMAS LAURO 159 169 . Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/2 4/2015. The Court hereby AFFIRMS the magistrate judge's order denying in relevant part Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive e lectronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on 8/25/2015. Thomas Lauro served a courtesy copy.
August 14, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS' 137 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF THOMAS LAURO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 8/14/2015. ~ The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Counsel M aria Ann Carmichael and DENIED as to Michael Jay Green, Earl I. Anzai, and Glenn H. Uesugi. Related doc: 158 EP: Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. Copy served to Plaintiff by first class mail on 8/14/2015.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauro v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lauro
Represented By: David K. Ahuna
Represented By: Joseph P.H. Ahuna, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Peter Ahuna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halawa Correctional Facility
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waiawa Correctional Facility
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisar Paderes
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Saldana
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dewitt
Represented By: Dennis K. Ferm
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?