Billete et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Joseph Billete and Marivel Billete |
Defendant: |
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Does 1-50 |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00061 |
Filed: |
February 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED JULY 31, 2013 re: 24 .. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/30/2013. ~ Order grants plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint "consistent with the terms of this Order." Plaintiffs must file their Second Amended Complaint by no later than November 18, 2013. Written order follows oral order of 10/15/2013 (minutes of hearing : doc. no. 31 ) ~ (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER JULY 2, 2013 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 17 21 . ~ Excerpt of Conclusion: "Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint by July 31, 2013. The Court CAUTIONS Plaintiffs that the failure to file their First Amended Complaint by July 31, 2013 will result in the automatic dismissal with prejudi ce of the claims that the 5/29/13 Order dismissed without prejudice." ~ Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/26/2013. [Written order follows the Court's 7/24/2013 Minute Order (doc no. 21 ) granting Motion for Reconside ration. Related: May 29, 2013 Order: doc no. 15 ] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail add ress listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED on 7/26/2013 to correct document number link to correlate to the Motion for Reconsideration. Motion for Reconsideration is doc. no. 17 . NEF REGENERATED. (afc).
|
May 29, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FILED JANUARY 16, 2013 re: 5 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/28/2013. ~ Order grants plaintiffs leave to file a First Amended Complaint; plaintiffs must file their First Amended Complaint by no later than July 1, 2013 ~ [Order follows hearing held on May 13, 2013. Minutes of hearing: doc no. 14 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SER VICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?