Bald et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
David Emory Bald and Emily Lelis |
Defendant: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., The Law Office of David B. Rosen, David B. Rosen and Doe Defendants 1-50 |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00135 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
236
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT BANKS re 170 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/8/2021. The motions for summary judgment (Lima, ECF No. 238; Gibo, ECF No. 260; Bald, ECF No. 170) are reinstated and granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Defendant Banks and to close these cases.(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
|
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. "The Court HEREBY GRANTS Plaintiffs 92 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed October 20, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Compl aint by November 27, 2017." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/20/17. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION THAT MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS BE DENIED re 63 , 64 - - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/10/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/25/13. "The court grants Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss. TheClerk is directed to enter judgment for Wells Fargo and to clo se this case." see footnote 2 on page 2 regarding 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Rosen -- " 2 Plaintiffs initially also sued David Rosen in both his professional and personal capacity. See ECF No. [ 1]. On March 21, 2013, Rosen filed a Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 5 . On July 1, 2013, before this court had heard argument on Rosen's Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs dismissed Rosen from this lawsuit. ECF No. 40 . Given Rosen's dismi ssal from this case, the court denies Rosen's Motion to Dismiss as moot." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 5, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S EX PARTE MOTION UNDER L.R. 40.2 TO ASSIGN SIMILAR CASE TO A SINGLE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE re: 18 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/5/2013. Excerpt of Conclusion: ~ "The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to reassign this case, including all pending motions in the instant case, to Chief United States District Judge Susan Oki Mollway and United States Magistrate Judge Richard L. Pugl isi." ~ Case reassigned to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY and U.S. JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI; Please reflect new case number CV 13-00135-SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. Motions referred to Chief Judge Susan Oki Mollway: (1) 5 Defendants The Law Office of David B. Rosen, a Law Corporation, and David B. Rosen's MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to State a Claim, and (2) 8 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?