Ogeone v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Galina Ogeone
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00166
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING "MOTION TO RECUSE CHIEF JUDGE MOLLWAY," DOC. NO. 93 .Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/16/2014. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifica tions received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on Friday, October 17, 2014.
November 25, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 87 , 92 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/25/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERV ICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on November 26, 2014.
January 23, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' REMAND DISCUSSION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/23/2015. "The court will enter an order remanding this case to state court if a corrected Declaration is filed within 4 cale ndar days of entry of this order and if, within 7 calendar days of entry of this order, it receives no written notice from either party that the party objects to the entry of an order remanding this case to state court." "Becaus e the court is not being actually presented with a motion by any party, this court is not treating the procedure described in this minute order as a "motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter juri sdiction" that, under 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), must be made within 30 days of the filing of the notice of removal under 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a)." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants reg istered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on January 26, 2015.
March 11, 2015 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL re 195 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/11/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on March 12, 2015.
May 4, 2015 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES re 213 , 217 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/4/2015. "Def endant is entitled to an award of $362.50 in attorneys' fees pursuant to section 607-14 of Hawaii Revised Statutes, and this court adopts the F&R." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone served by first class mail at the address of record on May 4, 2015.
July 19, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 32 , 36 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/19/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on July 22, 2013.
July 31, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 41 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/31/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone served by first class mail at the address of record on July 31, 2013.
September 30, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING NEGLIGENCE CLAIM; ORDER DENYING MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT re 54 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/30/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone served by first class mail at the address of record on September 30, 2013.
June 26, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECUSE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PUGLISI re 78 -Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/26/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Galina Ogeone served by first class mail at the address of record on June 26, 2014.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogeone v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Ogeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.