Evans v. Leap Frog Group et al
Plaintiff: Brian Evans
Defendant: Robert Wood Johnson Foundation (The), Leah Binder and Leap Frog Group
Case Number: 1:2013cv00269
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEE OR COSTS; AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION re 16 , 17 , 22 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUS AN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/30/13. "Evans may file a Third Amended Complaint that is complete in itself (that is, does not incorporate any prior complaint by reference) no later than October 30, 2013. He must also either pay the civil fil ing fee or submit a new IFP. Failure to meet the above deadline shall cause this action to be automatically dismissed." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifica tions received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans served by first class mail at the address of record on September 30, 2013. A copy of the court's application to proceed in forma pauperis shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Evans.
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND WHY APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS SHOULD NOT BE DENIED - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/29/13. "This court now dire cts Evans to file a memorandum showing cause why his Second Amended Complaint should not be dismissed and his latest IFP application should not be denied. The memorandum must be filed by August 15, 2013, and may not exceed 2,500 words (not includi ng any exhibits, declarations, or affidavits)." " Failure to submit the required memorandum shall result in the dismissal of this action." Show Cause Response due by 8/15/2013. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans served by first class mail at the address of record on July 30, 2013.
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT re 8 , 9 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/26/13. " Evans may file a Secon d Amended Complaint that is complete in itself (that is, does not incorporate any prior complaint by reference) no later than July 12, 2013. He must also either pay the civil filing fee or submit a new IFP. Failure to meet the above deadline shall cause this action to be automatically dismissed. Given the court's dismissal of Evanss Complaint, the court denies Evans's IFP as moot." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans served by first class mail at the address of record on June 26, 2013. A copy of the court's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Evans.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Leap Frog Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wood Johnson Foundation (The)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leap Frog Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?