Evans v. Massachusetts Nurses Association et al
Plaintiff: Brian Evans
Defendant: City of Methuen, Massachusetts, Methuen Police Department, Henry M. Nields, Office of the Chief Medical Examiner, Massachusetts Nurses Association, Holy Family Hospital (The), Steward Health Care System and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2013cv00272
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Outside state of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT re 20 , 21 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/12/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on July 15, 2013.
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT re 11 , 12 - - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/26/13. "The court does, howe ver, give Evans one more opportunity to state his case. He may file a Second Amended Complaint that is complete in itself (that is, does not incorporate any prior complaint by reference) no later than July 12, 2013. He must also either pay the civi l filing fee or submit a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Failure to meet the above deadline shall cause this action to be automatically dismissed." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipan ts registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans served by first class mail at the address of record on June 26, 2013. A copy of the court's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Evans.
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/25/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Brian Evans served by first class mail at the address of record on June 25, 2013.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Massachusetts Nurses Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Methuen, Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methuen Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry M. Nields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Nurses Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Family Hospital (The)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steward Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?