G P Roadway Solutions, Inc. v. Laborers International Union of North America Local 368
Plaintiff: |
G P Roadway Solutions, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Laborers International Union of North America Local 368 |
Counter_claimant: |
Laborers International Union of North America Local 368 |
Counter_defendant: |
G P Roadway Solutions, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00282 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re: 64 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/17/2014. (afc) [Order denies the Motion for Reconsideration of Order, doc no. 62 : The "Order (1) Denying Plai ntiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment." CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electro nic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 24 , AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 26 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/29/2014. Excerpt of Co nclusion: The arbitration award is CONFIRMED. Finding no bad faith on the part of Plaintiff, the court DENIES Defendant's request for an award of costs and attorney's fees on that basis. The court also awards prejudgment interest to D efendant on the arbitration award (excluding the $3,463 of interest in that award)." (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?