Faith Action For Community Equity et al v. State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: |
Faith Action For Community Equity, John Doe #1 and Jane Doe #1 |
Defendant: |
State of Hawaii, Hawaii Department of Transportation and Glenn Okimoto |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00450 |
Filed: |
September 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Housing/Accommodations |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
285
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re 276 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/1/2015. "Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys fees is granted. Plaintiffs are awarded $50,000.00 in fees." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
249
ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER TO ALLOW THE DEPOSITION OF REBECCA GARNDER re 200 , 225 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/5/2015. &q uot;The court affirms Magistrate Judge Puglisi's order of April 14, 2015, denying Faith Action's request to modify the Rule 16 Scheduling Order to allow Faith Action to take the deposition of Rebecca Gardner." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing
202
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS UNDER RULE 23(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE re 148 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/20/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 23, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER DENYING COUNTERMOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 126 , 136 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/23/2015. "A question of fact exists as to whether HDOT intentionally discriminated against people of vari ous national origins. This questions of fact precludes the countermotions for summary judgment. The parties are ordered to contact the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case to schedule a settlement conference at the earliest available date." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
151
ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS re 123 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/20/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
April 28, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ORGANIZATIONAL PLAINTIFF FOR LACK OF STANDING AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re 61 ; 62 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/28/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF S ERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER (1) AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DENIAL OF LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 37 ; 44 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/29/2014. &quo t;The Magistrate Judge's order denying Plaintiffs leave to proceed anonymously is affirmed. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended Complaint is denied. Any new motion for leave or stipulation to the filing of an amended Comp laint must be submitted no later than February 19, 2014, and either document must include as an attachment the proposed amended pleading." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to re ceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?