Debeikes v. Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Matthew J. Debeikes |
Defendant: |
Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Association of Flight Attendants and John Does 1 to 10 |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00504 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
ALAN C KAY |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Railway Labor Act |
Cause of Action: |
45 U.S.C. § 151 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
168
ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT HAWAIIAN AIRLINES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 11, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 § U.S.C. 1927 re [160 ], 162 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 2/1/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing
143
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS HAWAIIAN AIRLINES, INC. AND ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, AFL-CIO re 85 , 90 , 94 , 99 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KA Y on 10/28/2015. "For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that summary judgment is granted as to: Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Grant Summary Judgment, ECF No. 85; The Substantive Joinder of Association of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO in Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Grant Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 85], ECF No. 90; Defendant Association of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFLCIO's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 94; and Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Joinder to Defendant Association of Flight Attendants-CWA, AFL-CIO's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 94], ECF No. 99. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?