Suzuki v. Helicopter Consultants of Maui, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vernon Suzuki
Defendant: Helicopter Consultants of Maui, Inc., Nevada Helicopter Leasing LLC and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2013cv00575
Filed: October 30, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 300 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 AS TO THE FEBRUARY 7, 2012 "NO FURTHER ACTION" LETTER, ECF NO. 172 re 262 , 289 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/26/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 25, 2016 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 AS TO THE FEBRUARY 7, 2012 "NO FURTHER ACTION" LETTER, ECF NO. 172 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/25/2016. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held October 18, 2016. Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 262 .CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 8, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) AFFIRMING THE APRIL 28 ORDER, DOC. NO. 69 ; (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE, DOC. NO. 80 ; AND (3) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE, DOC. NO. 115 . Sig ned by CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/8/2016. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held July 1, 2016 on: (1) 80 Defendant Helicopter Consultants of Maui, Inc. dba Blue Hawaii an Helicopter's MOTION to Strike and Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses, (2) 81 Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to Magistrate's Order ["Plaintiff's Appeal of Order, docket entry no. 69 ] Docket entry no. 69 : "ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT REPORTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESET TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES" and (3) 115 Defendant's MOTION to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline for Limited Purpose of Filing a Motion for Summary Judgment. Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 134 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE< /center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
April 28, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT 47 AND MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT REPORTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,TO RESET TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES 49 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 4/28/2016. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held March 23, 2016 on Motion doc nos. 47 and 49 . MINUTES of hearing: doc. no. 62 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzuki v. Helicopter Consultants of Maui, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Suzuki
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helicopter Consultants of Maui, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Helicopter Leasing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?