Baham v. Association of Apartment Owners of Opua Hale Patio Homes et al
Plaintiff: |
Randolph Baham |
Defendant: |
Association of Apartment Owners of Opua Hale Patio Homes, Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP, Associa Hawaii and Jonah Kogen |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00669 |
Filed: |
December 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
HELEN GILLMOR |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
243
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, AS MODIFIED (ECF NO. 241 ). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 11/23/2015. ~ Pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 636(b)(1)(C) and Local Rule 74.2, the Findings and Recommendation (ECF No. 241) are adopted as the opinion and order of this Court with the following modifications: On Page 1, Paragraph 1, Line 3, replace "Petitions" with "Petitioners"; and On Page 7, Paragraph 6, L ine 1, the section citation should be "(d)", not "a." (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 18, 2014 |
Filing
75
ORDER Granting Association of Apartment Owners of Opua Hale Patio Homes and Associa Hawaii fka Certified Hawaii, Inc.'s 7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Denying Motion For a More Definite Statement as Moot and Granting Defendant Porter McGui re Kiakona & Chow, LLP's 15 Motion to Dismiss; and Denying Jonah Kogen's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff is Granted Leave to Amend. Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 6/18/14. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVI CEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER Denying 10 Defendant's MOTION to Disqualify The Law Firm of Revere and Associates LLLC. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 2/4/14. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electro nic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?