Katz et al v. American Express Company
Plaintiff: |
Norman Katz and Roseann Manning |
Defendant: |
American Express Company, Experian Corp., Equifax, Inc. and Transunion Corp. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00084 |
Filed: |
February 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
UNASSIGNED |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1681 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
107
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, DOC NO. 91 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/13/2015. (afc) Excerpt of concl usion: "[T]he court GRANTS AMEX's Motion to Dismiss, without leave for Plantiffs to amend as to AMEX. Plaintiffs' claims against the CRA Defendants remain." "AMEX" - American Expres s Company ["AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES"CRA [credit report agency] Defendants: Experian Corp.; Equifax, Inc.; and Trans Union Corp.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to recei ve electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS "FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT," DOC. NO. 70 ; (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT EQUIFAX, INC.'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER IN DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DOC. NO. 81 ; AND (3) GRANTING DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICE 'S MOTION TO DISMISS "FINAL AMENDED COMPLAINT," DOC. NO. 68 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/18/2014. Excerpt of conclusion: "Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Third Am ended Complaint by December 16, 2014. If Plaintiffs choose not to file a Third Amended Complaint by December 16, 2014, this action will proceed on Plaintiffs' FCRA claim against Transunion and Equifax (to the extent based on Equifax's fail ure to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint regarding the AMEX charge)." [Written Order follows hearing on motions held on November 17, 2014. Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 84 ] (afc)CERTI FICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
66
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT 45 , AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/20/2014. Excerpt of Conclusion: "The Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order and the court's June 17, 2014 Order. Failure to file a Second Amended Complaint by September 19, 2014 will result in automatic dismissal of this action." related: June 17, 2014 Order: doc. no. 49 . (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER (1) GRANTING EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (FILED MARCH 19, 2014), DOC. NO. 9 ; AND (2) GRANTING TRANS UNION LLC'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER, DOC. NO. 21 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/16/2014. Excerpts from the Conclusion: "[T]he court...DISMISSES the Amended Complaint as to all CRA [credit report agency] Defendants. Because AMEX [American Express Company] has recently filed its own Motion to D ismiss, the court will set a deadline for Plaintiffs to file a second amended complaint after it rules on AMEX's Motion with leave to amend." [WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held June 16, 2014 on motions 9 , 21 . Minutes of hearing: do cket entry no. 48 ] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?