Nalu Kai Incorporated v. Hawaii Airboards, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Nalu Kai Incorporated |
Defendant: |
Hawaii Airboards, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Hawaii Airboards, LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
Nalu Kai Incorporated |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00112 |
Filed: |
March 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
80
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING HAWAII AIRBOARDS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 6,066,016 IS VALID 36 ; AND DENYING NALU KAI INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF PATENT INVALIDITY 37 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/20/2015. ~ Amended Order amends the Court's order filed 12/04/2014 as docket entry no. 57 ~ Hawaii Airboards, LLC's ("HAB") Motion for Summary Judgmen t that U.S. Patent No. 6,066,016 Is Valid, filed July 26, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTED; and Nalu Kai's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity, also filed July 26, 2014 is HEREBY DENIED. Counts II, III and IV from the Complai nt and Counterclaim Counts I and II from the Counterclaim remain. Count I from the Complaint remains, but only as to claims of invalidity that are alleged in the Complaint but have not been ruled on in this Order. (afc )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART NALU KAI INCORPORATED'S L.R. 60.1 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DECEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER (DOCKET NO. 57 ) re 58 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/27/20 15. (eps) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER GRANTING HAWAII AIRBOARDS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 6,066,016 IS VALID; AND DENYING NALU KAI INCORPORATED'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF PATENT INVALIDITY re 36 Motion for Summary Judgm ent; re 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/04/2014. -- HAB's Motion for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent No. 6,066,016 Is Valid, filed July 26, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTE D; and Nalu Kai's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity, also filed July 26, 2014 is HEREBY DENIED. Claims II, III and IV from the Complaint and Counterclaims I and II from the Counterclaim remain. (eps)< FONT SIZE=1>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART COUNTER-CLAIMANT HAWAII AIRBOARDS, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN OF COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(F) re 23 Motion to Strike 23 Certain of Counter-Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(f). Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/29/2014. -- HAB's Motion to Strike Certain of Counter-Defendant's Affirmative Def enses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), filed May 13, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?