March 1, 2016 |
Filing
227
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF CU PACIFIC AUDIT SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(C) re 224 Motion. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/01/2016. CU Pacif ic's Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(c), filed January 21, 2016, is HEREBY GRANTED, although on different grounds than those argued in the Motion. This Court FINDS that CU Pacific has waived its entitlement to recover any furthe r amounts from Third-Party Defendants, Takushi, Nishida, and Cheung as to Count I of CU Pacific's Second Amended Third Party Complaint, filed January 7, 2015. There being no remaining claims in this case, this Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Offi ce to enter final judgment and close this case immediately. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on March 2, 2016
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
222
ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF CU PACIFIC AUDIT SOLUTIONS, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS [ECF NO. 182 ]; AND ADOPTING THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/15/2016. -- OTS's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, filed August 6, 2015, is therefore GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Fee Motion is GRANTED insofar as this Court AWARDS OTS $47,379.75 in attorneys' fees and  6;20.00 in costs, for a total award of $47,399.75. The Fee Motion is DENIED in all other respects. This Court ORDERS CU Pacific to pay the award to OTS according to the terms set forth in the instant Order. (eps) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on January 19, 2016
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
186
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF'S 136 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SECOND AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/30/2015. ~ CU Pacific's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Second Amended Third Party Complaint, filed September 2, 2015, is HEREBY GRANTED. This Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of CU Pacific as to Count I of the Second Amended Third Party Complaint, filed January 7, 2015, agains t Defendant Nishida in the amount of $330,459.99, against Defendant Cheng in the amount of $21,607.00, and against Defendant Takushi in the amount of $78,138.55. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
110
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AS TO OTS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION re 78 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/30/2015. Third-Party Defendant OTS Employees Federal Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint as to OTS Employees Federal Credit Union, filed February 9, 2015, is HEREBY GRANTED. This Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to terminate OTS as a party o n July 24, 2015, unless Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CU Pacific Audit Solutions files a motion for reconsideration of this Order by July 17, 2015. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 30, 2014 |
Filing
59
ORDER GRANTING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT OTS EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION MOTION TO DISMISS re 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/30/2014. OTS's Motio n to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint, filed July 31, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTED. Third-Party Counts I and III are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Third-Party Count II is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CU Pacific shall file its second ame nded third-party complaint by January 12, 2015.This Court CAUTIONS CU Pacific that, if it fails to file its second amended third-party complaint by January 12, 2015 or if it fails to cure the defects in the remaining claim that are identified in this Order, this Court may dismiss the remaining claim with prejudice. This Court emphasizes that CU Pacific does not have leave to add any new parties, claims, or theories of liability. If CU Pacific wishes to do so, it must file a motion to amend a ccording the deadline set forth in the Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed August 6, 2014. [Dkt. no. 42 .] (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|