December 20, 2017 |
Filing
359
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 356 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/20/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electr onic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
338
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND FOR NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO FRCP RULES 50(B) AND 59 re 329 Motion for Judgment NOV. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 07/27/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
211
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 137 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 09/30/2015. -- On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed June 26, 2015, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENly, this Court: 1) GRANTS summary j udgment in favor of Defendants as to Counts II, III, IV, V, and VII; 2) GRANTS summary judgment in favor of Defendants Kent Green and Rachel Bridgewater as to Counts I and VI; and 3) DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to all other portions of Counts I and VI. There being no remaining claims against Green and Bridgewater, this Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to terminate them as parties. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPartici pants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL THE COURT'S JANUARY 30, 2015 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [DOC. 74 ] (28 USC § 1292(B)) re 76 Defendants' Motion to Certify for an Interlocutory Appeal the Court's January 30, 2015 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. [74[] (28 USC Section filed by Kent Green, Don Carano, Rachel Bridgewater, Rick Banis, Western Equities, LLC, John Mackall, Fred Sca rpello, WNP Enterprises LLC. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/27/2015. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
74
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DOC. 38 ] 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/30/2015. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [Doc. 38], filed August 4, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED insofar as:- Count I is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant R acquel Bridgewater;- the portion of Count III alleging a tort claim for bad faith is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all Defendants;- the portion of Count III alleging a contract claim against Bridgewater for breach of the covenant of good fai th and fair dealing is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and - Counts II, IV, V, and VI are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants.Defendants' Motion is DENIED in all other respects.Plaintiff has until March 2, 2015 to file her seco nd amended complaint, consistent with the terms described in this Order. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED MOTION TO STRIKE & FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT 34 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 07/14/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO REMAND 15 Motion to Strike ; 7 Motion to Remand Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/25/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|