Hawaii Floriculture And Nursery Association v. County of Hawaii
Plaintiff: |
Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pacific Floral Exchange, Inc., Hawai'i Cattlemen's Council, Inc., Big Island Banana Growers Association, Hawai'i Papaya Industry Association, Hawai'i Floriculture And Nursery Association, Richard Ha, Jason Moniz, Gordon Inouye and Eric Tanouye |
Defendant: |
Hawai'i, County of |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00267 |
Filed: |
June 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
UNASSIGNED |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Nature of Suit: |
Commercial/ICC Rates/etc. |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
70
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CLAIMS ONE AND TWO OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT re 28 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 11/26/2014. "In light of the foregoing, the Court grants partial summary judgment on Claim 1 for express preemption under federal law, but only to the extent that express federal preemption applies to the Ordinance's ban on field testing of genetically engineered plants that are "plant pests" or "noxious weeds" and are regulated under 7 C.F.R. Part 340. The Court declines to find that the Ordinance is impliedly preempted by federal law. On Claim 2, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of Plaintiffs, concluding that the O rdinance is preempted by Hawaii state law." "Accordingly, the Court enjoins the County from further implementing or enforcing Ordinance 13-121, codified as Hawaii County Code §§ 14-128 et seq. This Order is dispositive o f this case. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant County of Hawaii." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 22, 2014 |
Filing
50
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 34 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 08/22/2014. The Court grants Proposed Intervenors amicus status. The Court amends the briefing schedule for the pending Motion for Summary Judgment: Defendant and Amici Curiae may file one opposition memorandum each, no later than September 18, 2014; Plaintiffs may file a reply memo randum no later than October 9, 2014 (eps) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?