Murphy v. Kimoto et al
Plaintiff: |
Matthew Keone Murphy |
Defendant: |
Sherri Kimoto, Todd Thomas and Holley |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00022 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
11
TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/20/2015. ~ This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, Phoenix Division ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE< /center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
7
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 Complaint filed by Matthew Keone Murphy, (Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2015.) Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/29/2015. (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim for the reasons detailed above. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1).(2) Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above on or before March 2, 2015. Failure to timely amend the Complaint and cure its pleading deficiencies will result in dismissal of this action for failure to state a claim.(3) If Plaintiff decides to amend his Complaint, he is Ordered to Show Cause on o r before March 2, 2015 why venue in Hawaii, rather than Arizona, is proper. In the alternative, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice on or before March 2, 2015. (4) The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff court forms for a prisoner civil rights complaint so that he can comply with the directions in this Order. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?