Benihana of Tokyo, LLC v. Angelo, Gordon & Co. et al
Plaintiff: |
Benihana of Tokyo, LLC |
Defendant: |
Angelo, Gordon & Co., Benihana, Inc. and Noodle Time, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00028 |
Filed: |
January 26, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
ALAN C KAY |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 46 , 47 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 9/14/2015. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court OVERRULES Defendants' Objections and ADOPTS the magistrate judge's Finding and Recommendation to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Local Counsel for Plaintiff's Application Regarding Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs and P laintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. The Court awards Plaintiff $37,772.362 in attorneys' fees, costs, and actual expenses incurred as a result of removal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c)." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND re: 25 . Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 6/1/2015. (afc) Doc nos. re: Objec tions to F&R: 28 , 30 , 34 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?