Cabaluna et al v. Human Health Service, Secretary Of et al
Plaintiff: |
Mary Gold Cabaluna and T. T. |
Defendant: |
Human Health Service, Secretary Of, Minority Populations, Kalihi Kai Elementary, Education, Department of, Japanese Government and Affordable Care Act |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00112 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 5, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/05/2015. Plaintiffs' Complaint, which this Court previously dismissed without prejudice, is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This Cour t DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to close the case on September 2, 2015, unless Plaintiffs file a motion for reconsideration of this Order by August 26, 2015 (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on 08/06/2015
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER STRIKING PROPOSED COMPLAINT FILED ON MAY 11, 2015 filed by T. T., Mary Gold Cabaluna This Court ORDERS that any amended complaint in this case must be filed by June 26, 2015. This Court emphasizes that T.T. may only file an amended complaint through counsel. This Court CAUTIONS Cabaluna and T.T. that, if they fail to file an amended complaint by June 26, 2015, this Court will issue an order dismissing this case with prejudice and directing the Clerks Office to close the case. This Court also CAUTIONS Cabaluna that, if she files an amended complaint which includes claims that are duplicative of claims in CV 14-480, or claims which this Court cannot consider under the Rooker-Feldman doctrine, those claim s will be dismissed with prejudice. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on May 27, 2015
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?