HTK Hawaii, Inc. vs. Kevin Sun, et al.
Plaintiff: |
HTK Hawaii, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Kevin Sun and Nicole Yang |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00114 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 7, 2016 |
Filing
209
ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 146 ; AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARYJUDGMENT, ECF NO. 154 ; EXHIBIT "A". Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MIC HAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/7/2016. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held on September 26, 2016. Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 198 . Letter Briefs re: Motion 154 : doc. nos. 204 , 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
77
ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, DOC. NO. 58 ; AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, DOC. NO. 61 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/25/2016. ~ The only claim remaining in the FAC is HTK's claim for declaratory judgment (Count I). The court grants HTK leave to file a Third Amended Complaint asserting claims for unjust enrichment, breach of contract, and breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing (i.e., HTK may address the deficiencies the court identified in Counts II through IV in HTKs FAC). In addition, HTK's SAC contains claims for fraud and conversion; HTK may replead those claims in any Third Amended Complaint as well. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?