DeRosa v. Association of Apartment Owners of The Golf Villas et al
Plaintiff: Vincent DeRosa
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of The Golf Villas, Certified Management, Inc., John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Doe Partnerships 1-100 and Doe Entities 1-100
Case Number: 1:2015cv00165
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 45 Order. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/31/2016. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 6, 2016 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FILED ON MARCH 9, 2016, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY ISSUES TO HAW AII SUPREME COURT re 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 07/20/2016. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 05/06/2016. Defendants' Motion for S ummary Judgment, filed March 9, 2016, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as:- Plaintiff's bad faith claim, prima facie tort claim, selective enforcement of governing documents claim, and breach of fid uciary duty claim are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and - this Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of Defendants as to Plaintiff's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim, negligent infliction of emotional distress claim, negligenc e claim, gross negligence claim, Haw. Rev. Stat.§ 514B-105 claim, racketeering claim, and Haw. Rev. Stat.§ 514B-9 claim.The Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's breach of contract claim.Although the dispositive motions deadline h as passed, see Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed 8/3/15 (dkt. no. 23), at 7, this Court GRANTS the parties leave to file motions for summary judgment regarding the remaining breach of contract claim and the Haw. Rev. Stat. § 515-16(1) clai m, which was not addressed in the instant Motion. Any party wishing to file a motion for summary judgment regarding one or both of those claims must do so by May 31, 2016. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeRosa v. Association of Apartment Owners of The Golf Villas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent DeRosa
Represented By: Malia R. Nickison-Beazley
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of The Golf Villas
Represented By: Karin L. Holma
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Management, Inc.
Represented By: Karin L. Holma
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?