Kaohi vs. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.; et al.
Plaintiff: Roberta Kaohi, Leila Mei N. Matagiese, Gaylyn K. Turalde, Alron K. Kaohi, Maile A. Kaohi and Dawn Nakamitsu
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kauai Medical Clinic, Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC and Doe Defendants 1-100
Case Number: 1:2015cv00266
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2015 Filing 36 Acknowledgment of Receipt by the Fifth Circuit Court, State of Hawaii re #33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT. (emt, )
November 16, 2015 Filing 35 Letter to the Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii re #33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT, dated November 16, 2015. (emt, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 34 EO: In light of #33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2015 is hereby VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT re #24 , #25 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/27/2015. "Because no claim for any benefit under the Medicare Act is at issue, the court determines that this case was improperly removed. The court adopts the F&R and remands the case to the Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii. In addition to sending a copy of this order to the parties in this matter, the Clerk of the Court is directed, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447, to send a certified copy of this remand order to the Clerk of the Fifth Circuit Court, State of Hawaii. The Clerk of Court is additionally directed to close this case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 22, 2015 Filing 32 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Luria, April)
October 21, 2015 Filing 31 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/29/2015 to 11/12/2015 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 21, 2015 Filing 30 Scheduling Conference Statement Rule 16. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
October 20, 2015 Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Roberta Kaohi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Soldner, Woodruff)
September 21, 2015 Filing 28 RESPONSE To #25 Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; and Hawaii Permanente Groups Objections to Findings and Recommendations of Magistrate filed by Roberta Kaohi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Soldner, Woodruff) Modified on 9/22/2015 (emt, ).
September 15, 2015 Filing 27 ANSWER to #22 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim,,,, [re Defendants Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP and Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC's Answer to #22 Cross-Claim of Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (Filed August 26, 2015)] by Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC.(Luria, April)
September 15, 2015 Filing 26 Answer to Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Cross-claim ANSWER to #22 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim,,,, by Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kauai Medical Clinic.(Bliss, Bradford)
September 14, 2015 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS re #24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re #12 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court filed by Roberta Kaohi ; Certificate of Service filed by Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Peacott-Ricardos, Alana) Modified on 9/15/2015 (emt, ).
August 31, 2015 Filing 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/31/2015. "The Court FINDS that Defendants improperly removed this action and RECOMMENDS that the district court GRANT Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand this action to the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c)." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 27, 2015 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kauai Medical Clinic, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC. (emt, )
August 26, 2015 Filing 22 Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Answer to Defendants Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, and Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC's Cross-Claim ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Defendants Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP and Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
August 24, 2015 Filing 21 REPLY re #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court, 14 Link,, Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court filed on July 30, 2015 filed by Alron K. Kaohi, Maile A. Kaohi, Roberta Kaohi, Leila Mei N. Matagiese, Dawn Nakamitsu, Gaylyn K. Turalde. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Soldner, Woodruff)
August 13, 2015 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court filed by Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
August 11, 2015 Filing 19 Answer to Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii LLP and Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC's Cross-Claim ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kauai Medical Clinic. (Bliss, Bradford)
August 10, 2015 Filing 18 STATEMENT of No Position re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court filed by Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC. (Luria, April)
August 6, 2015 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC [Re: Defendants Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP, and Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC's Answer to Complaint (Filed June 8, 2015); Cross-Claim Against Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.; Kauai Medical Clinic; Hawaii Pacific Health; and Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc.; Summons; Certificate of Service (Filed July 2, 2015)] (Luria, April)
August 5, 2015 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kauai Medical Clinic, Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc.. (Bliss, Bradford)
August 5, 2015 Filing 15 STATEMENT of No Position re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court filed by Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kauai Medical Clinic. (Bliss, Bradford)
July 31, 2015 Filing 14 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide #12 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 30, 2015 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC, Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP. (Luria, April)
July 30, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action Back to State Court Woodruff K. Soldner appearing for Plaintiff Roberta Kaohi (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Woodruff K. Soldner, #3 Exhibit "1", #4 Certificate of Service)(Soldner, Woodruff)
July 29, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 15-00266 SOM-RLP on all further filings. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
July 21, 2015 Filing 10 Amended EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2015 is CONTINUED to 10/29/2015 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 10/22/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 21, 2015 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2015 is CONTINUED to 10/29/2015 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 10/29/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 16, 2015 Filing 8 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/22/2015 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 15, 2015 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Amendment to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Certificate of Service. (Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
July 15, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TO BE SET Before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 15, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 15-00266 RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
July 14, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
July 14, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
July 14, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1578177), filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaohi vs. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Kaohi
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Mei N. Matagiese
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylyn K. Turalde
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alron K. Kaohi
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maile A. Kaohi
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Nakamitsu
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Gail Y. Cosgrove
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Gail Y. Cosgrove
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gail Y. Cosgrove
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauai Medical Clinic
Represented By: Bradford F.K. Bliss
Represented By: Thomas E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Pacific Health
Represented By: Bradford F.K. Bliss
Represented By: Thomas E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford F.K. Bliss
Represented By: Thomas E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Laboratories of Hawaii, LLP
Represented By: April Luria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Pacific Pathologists, LLC
Represented By: April Luria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?