Streamline Consulting Group LLC v. Legacy Carbon LLC dba Hawaiian Legacy Carbon et al

Plaintiff: Streamline Consulting Group LLC
Defendant: Legacy Carbon, LLC, Hawaiian Legacy Reforestation Initiative, HLH, LLC, Legacy Hardwoods, Inc., Legacy Holdings, LLC and Jeffrey Dunster
Case Number: 1:2015cv00318
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award and Granting Defendants' Countermotion To Confirm Arbitration Award re 73 75 .The court grants Defendants' motion to confirm the arbitration award and denies Plaintiff's motion to vacate or modify the arbitration award. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and to close this case. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/10/2019. (cib)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 37 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/16/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (1) DETERMINING THAT CLAIMS ARISING UNDER THE SERVICING AND NON-CIRCUMVENTION AGREEMENTS ARE SUBJECT TO ARBITRATION AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS; (2) DENYING REQUEST FOR FEES; AND (3) STAYING CASE EXCEPT WITH RESPECT TO THE ISSUE OF WHICH DE FENDANTS ARE SUBJECT TO THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT re 7 , 8 , 25 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/27/2016. "With respect to the parties' motion seeking to compel arbitration, this court determines that claims arising under the Services Agreement and/or the Non-Circumvention Agreement are subject to mandatory arbitration. But before sending any party to arbitration, this court will determine which parties are subject to the arbitration agreement. The court therefore stays this action, except with respect to the issue of which parties are subject to the arbitration agreement. The court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss and request for sanctions." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streamline Consulting Group LLC v. Legacy Carbon LLC dba Hawaiian Legacy Carbon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streamline Consulting Group LLC
Represented By: Tristan S.D. Andres
Represented By: Feesung S. Pang
Represented By: John Winnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Carbon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Legacy Reforestation Initiative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HLH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Hardwoods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dunster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?