In the Matter Of: The Complaint of Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00520 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 20, 2018 |
Filing
570
ORDER DENYING CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT OF CURE, ECF NO. 493. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/20/2018. (afc) Motion: ECF no. 493 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM, ECF No. 440 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM . WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 2/20/2018. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
489
ORDER: (1) GRANTING FOURTH-PARTY DEFENDANT PACIFIC SHIPYARDS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 355 , (2) GRANTING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/FOURTH-PARTY PLAINTIFF OWL INTERNATIONAL, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 359 , AND (3) DENYING CLAIMANTS MAKUA, GASPAR, AND ANTONIO'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 368 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/15/2017. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held November 13, 2017. Minutes of hearing: ECF 487 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS; 436 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM. Fourth-Party Defendant Pacific Shipyards International, LLC's MOTION for Summary Judgment or in t he Alternative to Sever or Continue Trial: ECF 355 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM, ECF 308 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM. Pacific Shipyards' motion decided without hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d). Pacific Shipyards' alternative motio n to continue or sever is moot. Third-Party Defendant/Fourth-Party Plaintiff Owl International, Inc.'s MOTION for Summary Judgment: ECF 359 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM, ECF 312 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM. Claimants Makua, Gaspar, and An tonio's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment: ECF 368 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM, ECF 321 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
241
ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT OWL INTERNATIONAL, INC., DBA GLOBAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, ECF NO. 160 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/15/2017. (afc)< font size=1>WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held June 13, 2017. Minutes of Hearing: ECF no. 240 in 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM and ECF no. 204 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM.Third-party Owl International, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss: ECF no. 160 in 1:15 -cv-00520-JMS-KJM and ECF no. 126 in 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJM.Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00520-JMS-KJM, 1:16-cv-00156-JMS-KJMCERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notificat ions received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?