Masuda-Cleveland v Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Marnie Masuda-Cleveland
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2016cv00057
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER : DENYING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS; AND ADOPTING, AS MODIFIED, THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 154 - Sig ned by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/19/2021. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff's Motion for A ward of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Filed on March 19, 2021 (ECF No. 154), which Defendant filed on April 2, 2021, is HEREBY DENIED. The magistrate judge's F&R is ADOPTED AS MODIFIED by the instant Order. This Court therefore AWARDS Plaint iff $364,946.80 in attorneys' fees and $3,472.76 in nontaxable costs, for a total award of $368,419.56. Defendant is ordered to pay the award by remitting payment to Plaintiff's counsel by no later than September 20, 2021. (emt, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Expanded ERISA Administrative Record 120 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/30/2020.(kob2)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S: (1) MOTION TO DETERMINE SCOPE OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; AND (2) MOTION TO DETERMINE APPLICABLE STANDARD OF REVIEW re 33 Motion re 35 Motion. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/31/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masuda-Cleveland v Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marnie Masuda-Cleveland
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Metzger
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?