Perez v. Kazu Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Thomas E. Perez |
Defendant: |
Kazu Construction LLC and Vernon Lowry |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00077 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
ALAN C KAY |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
113
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTM re 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 04/17/2017. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES I N PART Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion as to the statute of limitations issue is GRANTED as to equitable tolling but DENIED as to willfulness. The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED as to Richard Napierala, Frank Aguinaldo, James Dela Cuesta, Jaime Magallanes, Wesley Mericle, and Bruce Petree, and the Secretarys claims as to these CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
87
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: (1) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY SUBPOENA; (2) PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY re 46 , 55 , 62 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/15/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?