Rohr v. Crime Victims Compensation Commission
Plaintiff: Claudia Rohr
Defendant: Crime Victims Compensation Commission
Case Number: 1:2016cv00162
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: 1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 134 , 137 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/22/2019. On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on March 6, 2019, is HEREBY GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on March 8, 2019, is HEREBY DENIED. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to e nter final judgment in favor of Defendant on August 20, 2019, unless Plaintiff files a motion for reconsideration of this Order by August 19, 2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Ser vice - Claudia Rohr served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 22, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION OR RECONSIDERATION OF THE ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED JULY 6, 2016 re 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/28/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on February 28, 2017
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON JUNE 6, 2016 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed June 6, 2016.. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/23/2016. < br> (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on November 25, 2016
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohr v. Crime Victims Compensation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crime Victims Compensation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?