Atlas Copco Compressors LLC v. RWT LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Atlas Copco Compressors LLC |
Defendant: |
RWT LLC and Arch Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00215 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
ALAN C KAY |
Presiding Judge: |
KENNETH J. MANSFIELD |
Nature of Suit: |
Miller Act |
Cause of Action: |
40 U.S.C. § 270 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAY PENDING THAT APPEAL re 51 MOTION for Reconsideration re 50 Order. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 07/ 13/2017. This action is STAYED pending the Ninth Circuit's decision on whether to accept the interlocutory appeal. Should the Ninth Circuit permit such appeal, this action is further STAYED pending the issuance of a d ispositive order on Plaintiff's interlocutory appeal.The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to inform the Court within 7 days of the Ninth Circuit's decision on whether to permit an appeal, and if applicable, the Ninth Circuit's ultimate reso lution of the interlocutory appeal. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
May 17, 2017 |
Filing
50
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 32 Motion for Summary Judgment re 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 05/17/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Docket Text Modified on 5/17/2017 (eps, ).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?