Webb v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Frank Webb, Jr.
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv00233
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND DIRECTING THAT THE CASE BE CLOSED. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/17/2017. Plaintiff's § 552a(d) claim, his IIED claim, and his claim a sserting a § 405(g) appeal are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 60: 20 MOTION For Relief Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 filed by Frank Webb, Jr.., Case reopened.. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/16/2017. < font size = 1> Instructions to the Parties Plaintiff must file his amended complaint by October 10, 2017. Plaintiff's Contact Information If Plaintiff's address changes while this case is pending, he must inform D efendant's counsel and the Court about the change. If Plaintiff is unable to receive mail at any address, he may file a notice with a telephone number where he can be contacted when court filings are available for him to pick up at the Clerk& #039;s Office during regular business hours. If Plaintiff is unable to provide either a mailing address or a telephone number, he must file a notice informing Defendant's counsel and the Court of the situation. Plaintiff will then be responsibl e for periodically contacting the Clerk's Office at least once a week to find out of if there are court filings available for him to pick up. If Plaintiff files either a notice that he does not have a mailing address or a notice that h e does not have either a mailing address or a telephone number, Defendant may serve filings on Plaintiff by leaving them at the Clerk's Office. Service on Plaintiff in this manner will only be effective if Defendant: delivers Plaintiff's co pies of Defendant's filings to the Clerk's Office; and informs Plaintiff that one of Defendant's filings is available for him at the Clerk's Office, if Plaintiff has provided a telephone number. Defendant's certificate of ser vice must certify compliance with these requirements. If Defendant fails to comply with these requirements, the filing will not be considered to have been served on Plaintiff and the filing may be stricken. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on August 17, 2017
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING REMAINING CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE AND DIRECTING THAT THE CASE BE CLOSED. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/14/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on June 15, 2017
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO FILE LETTER BRIEFS REGARDING THE REMAINING CLAIM. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/25/2017. This Court ORDERS Defendant to file an answer to the Comp laint, as to Count IV only, by no later than February 13, 2017.In addition, this Court ORDERS the parties to submit letter briefs addressing how the remaining claim will be litigated. Plaintiff's letter brief and Defendant's letter brie f must each be three pages or less, and each party must submit his or her respective letter brief directly to this Court's chambers by no later than March 1, 2017 (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipa nts registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on January 26, 2017
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/23/2016. Pla intiff must file his motion for leave to file an amended complaint by January 19, 2017, and the motion must comply with the rulings in this Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on November 25, 2016
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?