Matthews v. The Bank Of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: |
Richard A. Matthews, Donilee J. Matthews and Jennette E. Matthews |
Defendant: |
The Bank Of New York Mellon |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00288 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Maui |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Truth in Lending |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 14, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re 44 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jennette E. Matthews, Richard A. Matthews, Donilee J. Matthews.. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/14/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT. 26 ] re 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/30/2017. Defendant's Motion t o Dismiss First Amended Complaint [Dkt. 26 ], filed on January 21, 2017, is HEREBY GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Relief, filed on December 27, 2016, is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court DI RECTS the Clerk's Office to enter judgment and close this case on July 21, 2017, unless Plaintiffs file a motion for reconsideration of this Order by July 17, 2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?