Atooi Aloha, LLC, by Millicent Andrade and Craig B. Stanley, Its Managing Members et al v. Gaurino et al
Plaintiff: Atooi Aloha, LLC, Millicent Andrade, Craig B. Stanley and Edmon Keller (The) and Cleavette Mae Stanley Family Trust
Defendant: Abner Gaurino, Abigail Gaurino and Investors Funding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00347
Filed: June 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM re 479 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/16/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Millicent Andrade and Craig B. Stanley have been served by First Class Mail to the address of record on July 16, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF CRAIG B. STANLEY, INDIVIDUALLY; THE EDMON KELLER AND CLEAVETTE MAE STANLEY FAMILY TRUST, BY CRAIG B. STANLEY, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; AND CRAIG B. STANLEY, TRUSTEE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/15/2019. (emt, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS ATOOI ALOHA, LLC; CRAIG B. STANLEY, as Trustee for THE EDMON KELLER AND CLEAVETTE MAE STANLEY FAMILY TRUST; CRAIG B. STANLEY; and MILLICENT ANDRADE [DOC. 374]"Upon considera tion of the pleadings, motion and memoranda of the parties, and the record and files herein, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HERBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED and Plaintiffs deadline to retain new counsel is January 11, 2019." Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 1/9/2019. (jo)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re: 358 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 12/13/2018. (afc)Order adopts the "FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO GRANT DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF APT-320 LLC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS," ECF 358 .
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF APT-320 LLC'S MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE, DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS, AND DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT re: 329 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/19/2018. (afc)WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 10/19/2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 349 .
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY DECREE OF FORCLOSURE re: 164 , 166 , 191 , 202 . "A proposed Foreclosure Decree and selection of a foreclosure Commissioner should be provided to this cou rt by February 12, 2018" Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/31/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 1/22/2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPa rticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atooi Aloha, LLC, by Millicent Andrade and Craig B. Stanley, Its Managing Members et al v. Gaurino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atooi Aloha, LLC
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Brian K. Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Andrade
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Brian K. Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig B. Stanley
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Brian K. Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmon Keller (The) and Cleavette Mae Stanley Family Trust
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Brian K. Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abner Gaurino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abigail Gaurino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?