Marine Lumber Co. vs. Precision Moving & Storage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marine Lumber Co.
Defendant: Precision Moving & Storage, Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-50
Case Number: 1:2016cv00365
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING APPEALS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDERS FILED ON JUNE 1, 2017, AUGUST 16, 2017, AND AUGUST 17, 2017 re 130 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Marine Lumber Co. re 106 Orde r re 76 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court filed by Precision Moving & Storage, Inc., re 124 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Precision Moving & Storage, Inc. re 105 Memorandum & Opinio n. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/17/2017. The following are HEREBY DENIED: Defendant's June 9, 2017 appeal of the magistrate judge's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Pr otective Order and Sanctions for Discovery Abuse; Defendant's August 25, 2017 appeal of the magistrate judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order on Discovery Issues; and Plaintiff's August 31, 2017 appeal of the magistrate judge's Ord er Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. The magistrate judge's orders are AFFIRMED, and Defendant is ORDERED to comply with the June 1, 2017 order and the August 16, 2017 order by the deadlines set forth in the instant Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON DISCOVERY ISSUES: re 82 MOTION for Sanctions for Discovery Abuse filed by Marine Lumber Co., re 80 MOTION to Hold Defendant in Contempt for Failure to Appear and For Sanctions for Discovery Abuse filed by Marine Lumber Co... Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 08/16/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/28/2017. The denial of the Motion is WITHOUT PREJUDICE insofar as Plaintiff may file a new motion seeking summary judgment after the record is more fully developed. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Lumber Co. vs. Precision Moving & Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Lumber Co.
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Represented By: Edward K. Pineda-Akiona
Represented By: Joshua D. Stadtler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Moving & Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?