De La Fuente v. Nago et al
Plaintiff: |
Roque De La Fuente |
Defendant: |
Scott T. Nago and Hawaii, State of |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00398 |
Filed: |
July 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
KENNETH J. MANSFIELD |
Nature of Suit: |
Voting |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
33
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 07/07/2017. The claims in Plaintiff's Complaint that the Court previously dismissed without prejudice are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDI CE. There being no remaining claims in this case, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to enter final judgment and close this case on July 28, 2017, unless Plaintiff files a motion for reconsideration of this Order by July 24, 2017. The final ju dgment shall be in favor of Defendants pursuant to the 3/28/17 Order and ths instant Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/28/2017. Plaintiff must file his motion for leave to file an amended complaint by May 9, 2017, and the motion must comply with the rulings in this Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?