Brown et al v. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP et al
Plaintiff: |
Benita J. Brown, Craig Connelly and Kristine Connelly |
Defendant: |
Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, AOAO Terrazza/Corbella/Las Brisas/Tiburon, AOAO Ko Olina Kai Golf Estates and Villas and Doe Defendants 1-100 |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00448 |
Filed: |
August 10, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
201
ORDER Striking Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint and Dismissing With Prejudice Claims Dismissed Without Prejudice In The July 5, 2018 "Order Granting Defendant Ekimoto & Morris, LLL's Motion To Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint Filed May 8, 2018" re 186 182 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/21/2018. (cib, )
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ASSOCIATION OF APARTMENT OWNERS OF TERRAZZA/CORTBELLA/LAS BRISAS/TIBURON'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING DEFENDANT ASSOCIATION OF APARTMENT OWNERS OF KO OLINA KAI GOLF ESTATES AND VILLAS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEA DINGS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT EKIMOTO & MORRIS, LLLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT PORTER MCGUIRE KIAKONA & CHOW, LLP'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER IN THE E&M MOTION re 40 Mot ion to Dismiss; re 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; re 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; re 65 Motion for Joinder. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 08/30/2017. This Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint that includes: Count I, as pled in the original Complaint; the claims that Plaintiffs alleged against the AOAO Defendants in Counts II and III of the original Complaint; an amended FDCPA coun t against the Law Firm Defendants which addresses the defect identified in this Order; and the class action allegations, which this Court did not address in this Order. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint by October 11, 2017. Because thi s Court has given Plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint, the Terrazza AOAO and the Law Firm Defendants do not need to file answers to the original Complaint. Because this Court has not granted Plaintiffs leave to amend their claims against th e AOAO Defendants, the Terrazza AOAO and the Ko Olina AOAO must file their respective answers to the amended complaint by October 25, 2017, and they must obtain leave from this Court before filing any Rule 12 motions in lieu of their respective answe rs to the amended complaint. The Law Firm Defendants must file their respective answers to the amended complaint by November 1, 2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?