Auld-Susott v. Galindo
Plaintiff: Evan Auld-Susott and John L. Susott
Defendant: Lauryn Galindo
Case Number: 1:2016cv00450
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 178 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/18/2019. (emt, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/28/2019. (cib)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Of This Court's Summary Judgment Order Filed on June 27, 2017 re 130 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/10/2018. (cib, )
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS COURT'S RULING THAT SHE MAY NOT CALL ANY WITNESSES AT TRIAL re 129 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/9/2018. On the basis of th e foregoing, Defendant Lauryn Galindo's Motion for Reconsideration of This Court's Ruling That She May Not Call Any Witnesses at Trial, filed July 3, 2018, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the Galindo Declaration will be considered, and Defendant must be available for cross-examination. The Starr Declaration will not be considered. (emt, )
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Denying Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment re: 78 80 ."On the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed January 31, 2018, is HEREBY GRANTED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, also filed January 31, 2018, is HEREBY DENIED." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/27/2018. (cib, )
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 04/09/2018. (eps, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auld-Susott v. Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Auld-Susott
Represented By: Peter S. Knapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Susott
Represented By: Peter S. Knapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauryn Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?