Kim v. Crocs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Flora Kim and David Kang
Defendant: Crocs, Inc., Hilton Hawaiian Village LLC, Does Entities 1-10, John and/or Jane Does 1-10 and Hilton Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00460
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT/ THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/CROSS-CLAIMANT/ CROSS-CLAIM DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOHN W. KOSHAK A ND STRIKE REPORT OF ELEVATOR SAFETY SOLUTIONS, INC.; AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/CROSS-CLAIMANT/ CROSS-CLAIM DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF JOSEPH L. STABLER AND STRIKE REPORT OF STABLER ASSOCIATES, INC. 308 , 309 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/25/2019. (emt, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER: 1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT CROCS INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT MILLER ENGINEERING INC. 299 AND 2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF ANTHONY HAYTER. 295 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 12/7/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 11/16/2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 373 .
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CROCS INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL OPINIONS OF MILLER ENGINEERING INC. re: 296 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 11/27/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held November 16, 2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 373 .
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re: 301 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2018. (afc) Order adopts the "FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANTS HILTON MANAGEMENT LLC AND HILTON HAWAIIAN VILLAGE LLC'S PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT." re: 269

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Crocs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Kim
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Leslie Chaggaris
Represented By: Sarah R. Devine
Represented By: Pete D. Marketos
Represented By: Jerry Mark Perrin
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kang
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Leslie Chaggaris
Represented By: Sarah R. Devine
Represented By: Pete D. Marketos
Represented By: Jerry Mark Perrin
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crocs, Inc.
Represented By: Matt A. Tsukazaki
Represented By: Julie M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hawaiian Village LLC
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Patricia M. NaPier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Patricia M. NaPier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?