Adon Construction Inc.; et al. vs. Renesola America Inc.; et al.
Plaintiff: Adon Construction Inc. and Green Vision LLC
Defendant: Renesola America Inc., Kivalu Ramanlal, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10 and Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00568
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Presiding Judge: DERRICK K. WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 117 , 121 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/23/2019. For the foregoing reasons, Counts V and X are DISMISSED. Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED as to Count VI and DENIED as to Counts I and III. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Counts I, II, III, IV, VII, VIII, and IX. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT RENESOLA AMERICA INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF EXECUTIVE ORDER DENYING RENESOLA'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF PHILLIP ATOIGUE re 178 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 4/1/2019. (emt, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KIVALU RAMANLAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 12 , 38 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/4/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Ramanlal's Motion To Dismiss This Action As To Him , With Prejudice." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFFS ADON CONSTRUCTION INC. AND GREEN VISION LLC'S MOTION TO REMAND MATTER BACK TO THE FIRST CIRCUIT COURT OFTHE STATE OF HAWAII. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/6/2017. - The Court ADOPTS the Findings and Recommendation to Deny Plaintiffs Adon Construction Inc. and Green Vision LLC's Motion to Remand Matter Back to the First Circuit Court of the State of Hawaii and OVERRULES Plaintiffs' ; Objections. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adon Construction Inc.; et al. vs. Renesola America Inc.; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adon Construction Inc.
Represented By: Grant K. Kidani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Vision LLC
Represented By: Grant K. Kidani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesola America Inc.
Represented By: Lynda L. Arakawa
Represented By: Thomas Benedict
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kivalu Ramanlal
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?