Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC v. Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC
Defendant: Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc., Hawaiian Electric Company, Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc., Nextera Energy, Inc. and Hamakua Energy Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00634
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART DEFENDANT NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO. 148 . "NextEra's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Counts One and Two; th e federal antitrust claims against NextEra are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss the state law claims (Counts Seven and Eight) is DENIED without prejudice." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/9/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 7/9/2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 180 .
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S AND HAMAKUA ENERGY PARTNERS, L.P.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 73 & 95 , WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/19/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER amends the Court's Order filed 12/19/2017 as ECF no. 131 . Related: Order, ECF 136 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S AND HAMAKUA ENERGY PARTNERS, L.P.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 73 & 95 , WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Excerpt of conclusion:"The Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED as to Counts One and Two, and those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Because the court DEFERS ruling on the state-law claims, the Motions as to Counts Seven and Eight are DENIED without prejudice. The court will allow Hu Honua an opportunity to file a Second Amended Complaint that cures the FAC's deficiencies, if it believes it can do so. See Lopez, 203 F.3d at 1130. A Second Amended Complaint (or a statement indicating that a Second Amended Complaint will not be filed) is due by January 29, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/19/2017. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held November 6, 2017. Minutes of hearing: ECF 127 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC v. Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC
Represented By: Christian E. Baker
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Represented By: Rex Y. Fujichaku
Represented By: Kelly Anne Higa
Represented By: Barry W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Electric Company
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextera Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamakua Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?