Henao v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Jose Henao |
Defendant: |
Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC, John Does 1-5, Jane Does 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, Doe LLCs 1-5, Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5 |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00646 |
Filed: |
December 6, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Presiding Judge: |
DERRICK K. WATSON |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER Denying Motion For Relief From Judgment re 38 .There are many problems with the instant motion for relief from judgment. By not addressing all of them, the Court does not mean to suggest they do not exist. Hilton's opposition memorandum covers many of them, including the fact that the March 2018 Isa Declaration was signed in March 2018-seven months before the motion was filed. The Court elects, though, to deny the motion for the reasons set forth herein. Accordingly, Henao's motion for relief from judgment, Dkt. No. 38 , is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/13/2018. (cib, )
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 17 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/6/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant's' Motion for Summary Judgment. Dkt. No. 1 7. The Clerk's Office is directed to close the case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 7, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/7/2016. - Defendant HGVC is directed to file, by December 21, 2016, a jurisdictional statement clarifying its entity status, and, if appro priate, identifying the citizenship of its owners/members. If any owners/members of HGVC are themselves LLCs or limited partnerships ("LPs"), HGVC shall identify those LLCs and LPs and specify their citizenship as well. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?