Fountain v. United States et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronald Joel Fountain |
Defendant: |
United States, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00262 |
Filed: |
June 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
DERRICK K. WATSON |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/2/2017. "On the basis of the foregoing, the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice and directs the Clerk of Court to close this case." (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Ronald Joel Fountain served by first class mail to the address of record on August 2, 2017.
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 6 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/21/2017. "Based upon the foregoing, the IFP Application is GRANTED, and the Complaint is DISMISSED with limited leave to amend. Fountain is granted limited leave to file an amended complaint in accordance with the terms of this order by July 21, 2017. The Court CAUTIONS Fountain that failure to f ile an amended complaint by July 21, 2017 will result in the automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Ronald Joel Fountain shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on June 22, 2017.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?