The Bank of New York Mellon v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: |
The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWMBS Inc., CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2006-OA5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006 |
Defendant: |
Len C. Perry, Nathan Jon Lewis and 3925 Kamehameha Rd Princeville, HI 96722 LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00297 |
Filed: |
June 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
UNASSIGNED |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
112
ORDER AWARDING DAMAGES TO AND DIRECTING THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF 96 , 97 , 98 , 99 , 100 , 101 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/22/2019. For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff i s awarded damages in the total amount of $161,187.75. Perry and Lewis' Motions in Opposition, Dkt. Nos. 96, 99, Motions to Dismiss, Dkt. Nos. 97, 100, and Motions to Clarify Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement, Dkt . Nos. 98, 101, are DENIED. The Clerk is ORDERED to enter Judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $161,187.75, and then close this case. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Len C. Perry, Jr. and Nathan Jon Lewis served by First Class Mail to the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 22, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
September 11, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 51 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/11/2018. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. No. 51, is GRANTED. The Court grants summary judgment to BONY Mellon against Lewis and Perry on the second, third, and fifth claims for relief in the Complaint. (emt, )
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing
46
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 43 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/20/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electroni c notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Len C. Perry, Jr. and Nathan Jon Lewis served by first class mail to the addresses of record on December 20, 2017.
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTER-COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 23 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/27/2017. "Defendants are granted limited leave to file an amended counterclaim in acc ordance with the terms of this order by no later than December 29, 2017." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Len C. Perry, Jr. and Nathan Jon Lewis served by first class mail to the addresses of record on November 27, 2017.
|
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
33
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 28 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/20/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notif ications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Len C. Perry, Jr. and Nathan Jon Lewis shall be served by first class mail to the addresses of record on October 23, 2017.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?