WDCD, LLC v. iStar, Inc.
Plaintiff: WDCD, LLC
Defendant: iStar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00301
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF ACTION by iStar, Inc. - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/15/2019. This action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (emt, )
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING iSTAR INC.'S MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION UNDER 9 U.S.C. 3 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 8, 12(b)(6), AND 12(b)(7) re #13 , 27 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/16/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby GRANTS iStar's Motion to Stay this case, and directs the Clerk of Court to administratively close it. The administrative closing of this case is solely an administrative matter and does not impact, in any manner, any party's rights or obligations, has no impact on any limitation period applicable to this case, does not alter in any manner any previous rulings by the court, and does not require a filing fee to reopen the case. In addition, the parties are directed to notify the Court within 30 days after final resolution of the arbitration, with joint recommendations, if possible, regarding any further proceedings that may be necessary in this Court." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 14, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE by iStar, Inc. re 27 Order on Motion to Stay, Set Detailed Order Pending Deadline, Link,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Agreement to Arbitrate iStar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holland, Kristin)
November 2, 2017 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Dft. Mt. to stay litigation or in the alternative to dismiss held on October 6, 2017, before Judge Derrick K. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber - Gloria T. Bediamol, Telephone number - 808-541-2060,Email Address - gloria_bediamol@hid.uscourts.gov. PP. - 7 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. pp. 7. (gb@hid.uscourts.gov)
November 1, 2017 Filing 28 EO: Per Docket Entry 27 , which grants Defendant iStar, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) (ECF No. 13), the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2017 before Judge Richard L. Puglisi is vacated. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 16, 2017 Filing 27 EO: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant iStar, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) (ECF No. 13). This action is stayed , pending the completion of the parties' arbitration with Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., pursuant to the Arbitration Demand and Statement of Claims filed on September 19, 2017 by Defendant iStar, Inc. (and others). The parties are directed to jointly update the Court on the status of the arbitration at least semi-annually, or as circumstances warrant. A written order setting forth the Court's reasoning will follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. DOP=10/16/2017. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 16, 2017 Filing 26 Letter addressed to Judge Derrick K. Watson from Kristin Holland, Esq. and William J. Dorsey, Esq., dated October 13, 2017 re: Motion to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3, or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Under Rule 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7). (emt, )
October 6, 2017 Filing 25 EP: Hearing held on #13 Defendant iStar Inc.'s Motion To Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss Under Rule 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7). Discussion held.Parties ordered to meet and confer within seven days from today to attempt to reach an agreement. If an agreement cannot be reach within seven days, the parties will jointly submit a letter to the Court. Court will then issue its ruling on the motion. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 22, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) filed by iStar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Dorsey, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(Holland, Kristin)
September 20, 2017 Filing 23 Errata re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, to Stay Litigation (ECF 13). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meheula, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) filed by WDCD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barry A. Sullivan, #2 Certificate of Service)(Meheula, William)
August 16, 2017 Filing 21 STATEMENT of JURISDICTION filed by WDCD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Snow, Adam)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF WILLIAM J. DORSEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/7/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 4, 2017 Filing 19 EO: Based on the pending dispositive motion, see ECF No. #13 , the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 8/21/2017 to 11/21/2017 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 11/14/2017.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 3, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on #13 iStar Inc.'s Motion To Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) set for 10/6/2017 @ 09:30 AM before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/3/2017. "Accordingly, WDCD LLC is directed to file, by August 17, 2017, a jurisdictional statement identifying the citizenship of all owners/members." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 2, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 17-00301 DKW-RLP on all filings. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
August 1, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1907078.Kristin L. Holland appearing for Defendant iStar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Holland, Kristin)
August 1, 2017 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by iStar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holland, Kristin)
August 1, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Litigation Under 9 U.S.C. 3 Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss Under Rules 8, 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) Kristin L. Holland appearing for Defendant iStar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Holland, Kristin)
June 30, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WDCD, LLC. (Snow, Adam)
June 27, 2017 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2017 is continued to 9:15 AM on the same day in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Plaintiff's counsel shall inform Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 26, 2017 Filing 10 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0975-1890648 re #1 Complaint. (afc)
June 26, 2017 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
June 26, 2017 Filing 8 Summons in a Civil Action - ISSUED as to iStar, Inc. (afc)
June 26, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 8/21/2017 before U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Memo) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
June 26, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00301-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
June 26, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WDCD, LLC. (Meheula, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by WDCD, LLC. (Meheula, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Meheula, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against iStar, Inc., filed by WDCD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Meheula, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WDCD, LLC v. iStar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WDCD, LLC
Represented By: Adam T. Snow
Represented By: William Meheula
Represented By: Barry A. Sullivan
Represented By: Adam Townsend Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iStar, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Dorsey
Represented By: Kristin L. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?