Tylor v. SummitMedia, LLC
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and SummitMedia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00018
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Filing 11 EO: Mr. Dane K. Anderson informs the Court of their on going settlement discussion and requests a continuance. First continuance is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/12/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 04/30/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 04/23/2018. Counsel Dane K. Anderson to notify the parties. (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
January 16, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. SummitMedia, LLC. served through Rhonda Velardo of CSC Services of Hawaii Inc on 01/16/2018 (eps, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Alternatively, a fillable form is available at website address http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao120.pdf Once completed, please electronically file the form using filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Copyright Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office should you have further questions (808) 541-1890. (afc)
January 12, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
January 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SummitMedia, LLC. (afc)
January 12, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk of Court's MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 3/12/2018 before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/12/2018. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
January 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00018-ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
January 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
January 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1978662.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit C)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. SummitMedia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SummitMedia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?