Tylor v. Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00019
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 03/09/2018. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
March 9, 2018 Filing 19 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/9/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 3/18/2019 in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/17/2018. Discovery due by 1/18/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 9, 2018 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant. (Melchinger, Glenn)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT KAANAPALI BEACH RESORT ASSOCIATION, INC. ORDER, Attorney Glenn T. Melchinger for Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc. added. Attorney Shannon S Sheldon terminated.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 03/08/2018. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
March 6, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Please continue to reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 18-00019 RLP on all filings. (eps, )
March 2, 2018 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Dane)
March 2, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Dane)
February 22, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc.. (Sheldon, Shannon)
February 15, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc..(Sheldon, Shannon)
February 6, 2018 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/09/2018 at 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 09:15 AM, the same day, in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 3/02/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Anderson, Dane)
January 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
January 12, 2018 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Alternatively, a fillable form is available at website address http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao120.pdf Once completed, please electronically file the form using filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Copyright Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office should you have further questions (808) 541-1890. (cib, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Assignment To United States Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent To Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge)(cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
January 12, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 - Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399 - Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc.. (cib, )
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 3/9/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
January 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00019-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
January 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
January 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1978699.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit C)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaanapali Beach Resort Association, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon S Sheldon
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?