Roberts vs. Ballard; et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew Namiki Roberts
Defendant: Susan Ballard, Al Cummings and Russell Suzuki
Amicus Curiae: Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund
Case Number: 1:2018cv00125
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 67 EO: Mr. Stamboulieh's request is hereby GRANTED: the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (ECF No. #51 ); Defendant's (1) CROSS-CLAIM for Summary Judgment, and (2) Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. #54 ); and MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae (ECF No. #62 ), previously set for 11/18/2019 is hereby CONTINUED to Tuesday, November 26, 2019 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. The briefing schedule previously issued in the Court's Minute Order dated September 12, 2019 (ECF No. #57 ) shall remain as set. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 (1) CROSS-CLAIM for Summary Judgment, and (2) Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 65 Concise Statement in Opposition re #55 Concise Statement of Facts,,, filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 64 EO: #62 The Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief of Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund as Amicus Curiae set for 11/7/19 @ 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader is RESCHEDULED to 11/18/2019 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #62 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae : Motion Hearing is set for 11/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (tbf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunn, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund. (Bunn, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO WILLIAM JAMES TAYLOR, JR. re #59 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/16/2019. (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for William James Taylor, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2262066.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Amicus Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund (Bunn, Pamela)
September 13, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela W. Bunn on behalf of Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund on behalf of Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund. (Bunn, Pamela)
September 12, 2019 Filing 57 On September 4, 2019, Defendants Russell A. Suzuki, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Hawaii and Al Cummings, in his official capacity as the State Sheriff Division Administrator filed:DEFENDANTS RUSSELL A. SUZUKI AND AL CUMMINGS' (1) CROSS-CLAIM FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, and (2) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CROSS-CLAIM (ECF No. 54)and DEFENDANTS RUSSELL A. SUZUKI AND AL CUMMINGS' (1) CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ECF No. 55).In view of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, the previous briefing and the hearing schedule are modified as follows:Plaintiff shall file (1) his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) his Memorandum in Opposition and his Concise Statement of Facts in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before Thursday, October 3, 2019.Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before Thursday, October 24, 2019.The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 51) is CONTINUED to Monday, November 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. The hearing on Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 54) will be held at the same time. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(tl, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 56 Errata re #54 (1) CROSS-CLAIM for Summary Judgment, and (2) Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 55 CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #54 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, and Cross-Claim for Summary Judgment filed by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Cregor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit DD, #34 Exhibit EE, #35 Exhibit FF, #36 Exhibit GG, #37 Exhibit HH, #38 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 54 Defendants Russell A. Suzuki and Al Cummings' (1) CROSS-CLAIM for Summary Judgment and (2) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #51 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendants' Cross-Claim filed by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John) Filing event modified on 9/5/2019 to reflect as a cross motion for summary judgment (emt, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 53 On August 2, 2019, Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts filed: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 51)andPLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE AND CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ECF No. 52). Defendants shall file their Oppositions on or before Wednesday, September 4, 2019. Plaintiff shall file his Reply on or before Wednesday, September 25, 2019. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 51) shall be held on Monday, October 28, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.(tl, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 CONCISE STATEMENT in Support re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Andrew Roberts, #3 Exhibit B: Selected Pages from Defendants' RFA, #4 Exhibit C: Declaration of Michael Brave, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Docket text modified on 8/5/2019 (emt, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stephen D. Stamboulieh appearing for Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Expert Witness Designation Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki [Certificate of Service to State Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents] (Cregor, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki [COS to State Defendants Response to Pltf's First Set of Requests for Interrogatories to Defendants] (Cregor, John)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/29/2019. (emt, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 46 EP: Further Status Conference - Discussion held re: Plaintiffs Notice of Intent to File Motion to Lift Stay.Over the defendants' objection, the Court orders that the stay is LIFTED, and this case is put back on the trial track.Non Jury Trial is set for 4/28/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Gillmor.Mr. Stamboulieh requests shortened discovery.The Court will not grant this request today absent good reason and an agreement of the parties. Parties to discuss this issue, and may contact the Court if circumstances warrant it.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 4/28/2020 09:00 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/17/2020 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Settlement Conference is set for 1/24/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/27/2019. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Lift Stay by Andrew Namiki Roberts . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 4/10/2019 (emt, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 44 EO: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Stay Proceedings and Order filed on 12/17/18, the Non Jury Trial set for 7/23/19 @ 9:00 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/19 @ 10:30 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/19 @ 9:00 a.m. and Settlement Conference set for 4/16/19 @ 10:00 a.m. are vacated. The Status Conference by Telephone set for 4/29/19 @ 9:00 a.m. will REMAIN on calendar. Counsel to provide their telephone number to the CRM, Toni Fujinaga, at 541-1297. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00125 HG-RT on all future pleadings. (jo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 42 EP: Status Conference re: the Stipulation to Stay and to Reset Dates by Telephone - Discussion held re: rescheduling of the trial date.A Further Status Conference by Telephone is set for 4/29/19 @ 9:00 a.m. Status Conference is set for 4/29/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings and ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (cib, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 40 EO: The Status Conference set for 12/19/18 @9:00 AM will be by Telephone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 39 EO: Pursuant to Mr. Cregor's request, a Status Conference re: a Stipulation to Stay and to Reset Dates is set for 12/19/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki [Defendants Russell A. Suzuki and Al Cummings Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendants] (Cregor, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 37 EO: On November 9, 2018, Plaintiff filed:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (ECF No. #35 ) and PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ECF No. #36 ).Plaintiff's filings (ECF Nos. #35 and #36 ) do not conform to the District of Hawaii Local Rules.Plaintiff's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION and CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS (ECF Nos. #35 and #36 ) are STRICKEN for failing to comply with the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii.On November 9, 2018, Plaintiff also filed: PLAINTIFF'S ENTRY OF ADMISSIONS INTO EVIDENTIARYRECORD OF CASE. (ECF No. #34 ). The Court has no basis to know whether the parties have met and conferred with respect to Plaintiffs submission. In addition, the nature of the admissions requested may include material facts that are not subject to admission. Please refer to the Court's attached Minute Order for further details (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 36 (STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #37 Minute Order): CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Brave, #2 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Namiki Roberts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Stephen D. Stamboulieh, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 11/19/2018 (rls, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 (STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #37 Minute Order): MOTION for Summary Judgment Stephen D. Stamboulieh appearing for Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service Certicificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 11/19/2018 (rls, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by Andrew Namiki Roberts Entry of Admissions Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen D. Stamboulieh, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 33 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 7/20/2018. (emt, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 31 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion held.Non Jury Trial is set for 7/23/19 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Gillmor.Parties may stipulate to extend the discovery deadline, or a status conference may be scheduled. Plaintiffs counsel may participate by telephone.Further discussion held re: a consent decree, and the addition of another party to the case.Counsel to have meaningful dialogue while plaintiffs attorneys are here.Plaintiffs counsel to give Mr. Cregor any drafts they have.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given:Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2018. Non-Jury Trial is set for 7/23/2019 09:00 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/12/2019 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Settlement Conference is set for 4/16/2019 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/20/2019. Discovery due by 5/24/2019. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 30 Scheduling Conference Statement [Defendants Russell A. Suzuki and Al Cummings' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
July 12, 2018 Filing 29 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beck, Alan)
July 11, 2018 Filing 28 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE and hearing on PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BALLARD'S MOTION TO DISMISS-Discussion held.The Parties agree to the DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Defendant Susan Ballard, in her official capacity as the Chief of Police of Honolulu of Honolulu County.Ms. Winter's oral Motion to withdraw the INTERVENOR-APPLICANT CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU ("City") AND DEFENDANT SUSAN BALLARD'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUBSTITUTE THE CITY FOR DEFENDANT BALLARD AND DISMISS DEFENDANT BALLARD AS NAMED DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE(ECF No. #22 ) is GRANTED.Plaintiff's MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BALLARD'S MOTION TO DISMISS is DEEMED MOOT.The hearing on City and County of Honolulu and Chief of Police Susan Ballard's Motion to Intervene and/or Dismiss previously set for Monday, August 20, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor is hereby VACATED. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol.) (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Substitute Defendant City for Defendant Ballard as Named Defendant with Prejudice , the Motion is set for hearing at the same time as the scheduled Status Conference on Wednesday, July 11, 2018 at 10:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (rls, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Substitute Defendant City for Defendant Ballard as Named Defendant with Prejudice Alan A. Beck appearing for Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beck, Alan)
July 6, 2018 Filing 25 EO: At the Court's request, a Status Conference re: NOTICE of Dismissal for Susan Ballard (ECF No. #24 ), is set for Wednesday, July 11, 2018 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Mr. Beck and Mr. Stamboulieh, mainland counsel for Plaintiff, is permitted to appear by telephone. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Dismissal for Susan Ballard Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Beck, Alan) Modified on 7/5/2018 (Document is captioned "Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Susan Ballard in Her Official Capacity as the Chief of Police of Honolulu County; Certificate of Service") (emt, ).
June 28, 2018 Filing 23 EO: On Friday, June 22, 2018, Defendants City and County of Honolulu and Chief of Police Susan Ballard filed:INTERVENOR-APPLICANT CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU ("City") AND DEFENDANT SUSAN BALLARD'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUBSTITUTE THE CITY FOR DEFENDANT BALLARD AND DISMISS DEFENDANT BALLARD AS NAMED DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE (ECF NO. #22 )Plaintiff shall file his Opposition on or before Thursday, July 12, 2018.Defendants shall file their Reply on or before Thursday, July 26, 2018.A hearing on the Motion to Intervene and/or Dismiss shall be held on Monday, August 20, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (rls, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Substitute Defendant City for Defendant Ballard as Named Defendant with Prejudice Nicolette Winter appearing for Defendant Susan Ballard (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Nicolette)
June 4, 2018 Filing 21 State Defendants Russell A. Suzuki and Al Cummings' ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
May 28, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. Susan Ballard served on 5/23/2018 . (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 5/29/2018 (emt, ).
May 22, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Susan Ballard, re #17 . (emt, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 18 Summons (Proposed) (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
May 21, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Namiki Roberts)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
May 18, 2018 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
May 18, 2018 Filing 15 EO: Pursuant to John Cregor's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/18 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 7/19/2018 @ 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 7/12/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Cregor, Jr on behalf of Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki on behalf of Al Cummings, Russell Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
April 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. Russell Suzuki served on 4/4/2018 . (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 4/10/2018 (emt, ).
April 9, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. Al Cummings served on 4/4/2018 . (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 4/10/2018 (emt, ).
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. Susan Ballard served on 4/4/2018. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 4/10/2018 (emt, ).
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEPHEN D. STAMBOULIEH re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 4/6/2018. (emt, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Stephen Stamboulieh Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2013085.Alan A. Beck appearing for Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Beck, Alan)
April 2, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/4/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Susan Ballard, Chief of Police of Honolulu County. (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Russell Suzuki, Office of Attorney General. (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Al Cummings, State Sheriff Division Administrator. (emt, )
April 2, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #1 Complaint (entered in CM/ECF using the filing event "Exhibit") filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that the incorrect filing event, "Exhibit", was selected in the filing of the Complaint. For future reference only, the filing event for "Complaint" is located in the "Attorney Initiating Documents" category. The Clerk's Office has re-entered the Complaint in CM/ECF, refer to ECF No. 2 #3 . The filing party is further advised that the summonses attached to the Complaint and labeled "errata", could be filed electronically and as separate docket entries using the filing event "Summons (Proposed)", located in the "Service of Process" filing category. No further action is required. The Clerk's Office will issue the summonses attached to the Complaint. Lastly, please refer to LR10.2(b), which states "The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, facsimile number, and e-mail address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., Plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left-hand corner of the first page of each paper presented for filing..." No further action necessary. (emt, ) Modified on 4/2/2018 (emt, ).
April 2, 2018 Filing 3 (For clerical purposes only, the Clerk's Office re-entered the Complaint, see ECF No. #1 ): COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants - filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Namiki Roberts, #2 (Proposed) Summons as to Al Cummings, #3 (Proposed) Summons as to Russell Suzuki, #4 (Proposed) Summons as to Susan Ballard, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00125 HG-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 1 (refer to ECF No. #3 ) EXHIBIT . filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Errata, #3 Errata, #4 Errata, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Alan) Modified on 4/2/2018 receipt #: 0975-2011287, $ 400.00 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts vs. Ballard; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ballard
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Cummings
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Suzuki
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Namiki Roberts
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown For Gun Safety Support Fund
Represented By: Pamela W. Bunn
Represented By: William James Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?