Tylor v. Exotic Estates Intl., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Exotic Estates Intl., Inc., Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Tycoons, Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Exotic Estates Concierge, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00129
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, [DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE], by Exotic Estates Concierge, LLC, Exotic Estates Intl., Inc., Tycoons, Inc..(Melchinger, Glenn)
May 15, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Exotic Estates Concierge, LLC served on 4/11/2018, Tycoons, Inc. served on 4/11/2018 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Services)(Anderson, Dane) Modified on 5/16/2018 to reflect date of service (emt, ).
May 4, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights at U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, DC 20559-6000 on May 4, 2018. (emt, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018 is CONTINUED to 6/14/2018 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 6/07/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
April 4, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice(Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register Of Copyrights. (cib, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Exotic Estates Concierge, LLC, Exotic Estates Intl., Inc., Tycoons, Inc. (cib, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 5/30/18 at 9:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (cib, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00129-DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
April 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2012574.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Exotic Estates Intl., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exotic Estates Intl., Inc.
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tycoons, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exotic Estates Concierge, LLC
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?