Bodyguard Productions, Inc., v. Doe 1; et al
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,
Defendant: Doe 1 and Keith Norton
Case Number: 1:2018cv00276
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00276 JAO-RLP on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keith Norton. /s/ SUE BEITIA, CLERK OF COURT by AFC, Deputy Clerk. (afc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION for Entry of Default AGAINST KEITH NORTON Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 14, 2018 Filing 15 EO: In the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, filed on August 9, 2018, the Court extended the time for service up to and including November 16, 2018. See ECF No. #13 . On August 13, 2018, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons, which does not address the extension already granted by the Court and instead requests that the Court extend the time for service up to and including January 13, 2019. See ECF No. #14 . The Court finds that Plaintiff has not established good cause at this time for a further extension of the time to serve and DENIES Plaintiff's Motion without prejudice. If Plaintiff is unable to effect service by November 16, 2018, Plaintiff may file another motion at that time setting forth its efforts to identify and serve Defendant Doe 1 to date. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 EX PARTE Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/9/2018. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the Court finds good cause to extend the time for service up to and including November 16, 2018. Further, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued from September 11, 2018, to December 20, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. Motion terminated: #11 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 09:30AM on 12/20/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (emt, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,. Keith Norton. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Keith Norton. (emt, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the U.S. Copyright Office. (emt, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/11/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00276 JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe 1 d/b/a showboxappdownload.com, KEITH NORTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2061328.), filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodyguard Productions, Inc., v. Doe 1; et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?