Winkler v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Paul Winkler
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00278
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00278 JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/20/2018. re: #14 . (afc) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2018. Non Jury Trial is set for 8/20/19 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Seabright.If Mr. Winkler would like to advance the trial date, he may have a discussion with defense counsel or file a motion.A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 8/20/2019 09:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/9/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference is set for 5/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/20/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Re: Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC's Initial Disclosures) (Kasten, Ryan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE UNDER FRCP 26(C); Certificate of Service - by Paul Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation) (afc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 EO: Mr. Winkler is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/18 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kasten, Ryan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kasten, Ryan)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kasten, Ryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Kasten, Ryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kasten, Ryan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/20/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/19/2018. (afc) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Plaintiff Paul Winkler served at address 76 West Mahi Pua Place, Lahaina, HI 96761)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Kasten, Ryan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00278-JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC from Second Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 18-1-0263(2). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2062404), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Circuit Court Complaint; Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Summons, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kasten, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ryan B. Kasten
Represented By: Jade L. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?