Chandler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laurie Terryl Chandler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00280
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edric Ming-Kai Ching on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Ching, Edric)
August 7, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laurie Terryl Chandler. Commissioner of Social Security. (Osterhout, Karl)
July 26, 2018 Filing 13 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel from the Clerk's Office re #11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, dated July 26, 2018. (emt, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 12 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 7/26/2018. (emt, ) Modified on 7/26/2018 U.S. Marshals Service served through interoffice delivery on July 26, 2018. (emt, ).
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF KARL E. OSTERHOUT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 7/26/2018. (emt, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2062907. . (Lyons, Jennifer)
July 23, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the Declaration of Karl E. Osterhout submitted in support of docket number #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2062907. filed by Laurie Terryl Chandler, does not contain a scanned image of his signature. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.2., which states "An electronically filed document requiring the original, wet signature of an individual other than the CM/ECF user, such as affidavit or declaration, must contain the original or a scanned image of that individual's signature." The filing party refile the Declaration of Counsel to include the scanned image of the signature. For e-filing purposes, select the filing event "Declaration" from the "Other Documents" filing category. When prompted by the filing system, "link" the Declaration to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (emt, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (emt, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (emt, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (emt, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00280 HG-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2062907.Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff Laurie T. Chandler (Lyons, Jennifer)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff Laurie T. Chandler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jennifer)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Lyons, Jennifer)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Laurie T. Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Terryl Chandler
Represented By: Jennifer B. Lyons
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?