Hutton v. Ceridian HCM, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Calvin L. Hutton
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50, Ceridian HCM, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Ceridian Corporation Retirement Plan
Case Number: 1:2018cv00281
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice - James J Conway Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2085580.Michael A. Lilly appearing for Plaintiff Calvin L. Hutton (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lilly, Michael)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Mr. Lilly's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 10/30/2018 @ 9:00 AMbefore MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/23/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Hutton. Ceridian Corporation Retirement Plan, Ceridian HCM, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lilly, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 Summons in a Civil Action - ISSUED as to Ceridian HCM, Inc., Ceridian Corporation Retirement Plan, ahd Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: Summons ISSUED as to: CERIDIAN HCM, INC. and: #1 CERIDIAN CORPORATION RETIREMENT PLAN, #2 WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) (afc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Lilly, Michael)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Lilly, Michael)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Lilly, Michael)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/17/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/20/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00281-JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Calvin L. Hutton. (Lilly, Michael)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Rights to Employee Welfare Benefits Under ERISA against Ceridian HCM, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2063071.), filed by Calvin L. Hutton.(Lilly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutton v. Ceridian HCM, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceridian HCM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceridian Corporation Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin L. Hutton
Represented By: Valerie M. Kato
Represented By: Michael A. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?